Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0686796 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1997 | B1 | EP0686796 | 13.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407166 | 09.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69500679T | 15.01.1998 | T2 | DE69500679D1 | 16.10.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407166 | 09.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2109057T | 01.01.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9407166 | 09.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2721087 | 19.07.1996 | B1 | FR2721087 | 15.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407166 | 09.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5716035 | 10.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9407166 | 09.06.1994 |