EP0685550 - Process and plant having a preheating unit for the pyrolysis of waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Gérard 34bis, avenue de Colmar F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Marty, Eric 3, rue de la Réunion F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 95401176.3 | 19.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | FR19940006661 | 30.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9406661 | [1995/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685550 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685550 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C10B1/10, C10B53/00, C10B7/00, C10B7/04, F27B7/20, F28D7/12, F26B11/04, F26B7/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
F26B17/26 (EP,US);
C10B1/10 (EP,US);
C10B47/30 (EP,US);
C10B53/00 (EP,US);
C10B7/00 (EP,US);
C10B7/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Pyrolyse von Abfällen mit einer Vorwärmeinheit | [1995/49] | English: | Process and plant having a preheating unit for the pyrolysis of waste | [1995/49] | French: | Procédé et installation de pyrolyse de déchets ayant une unité de préchauffage | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1508578 (ARNOLD RUHR) [A] * figure .; claim - *; | [A]US3481720 (BENNETT JOHN D); | [A]US4066024 (O'CONNOR CHADWELL); | [Y]DE3233121 (WIENEKE FRANZ) [Y] 1-5,10,11 * figure .; claim - *; | [Y]EP0446930 (WAYNE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,10,11 * figure 4 *; | [AD]EP0485255 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [AD] 1-11 | by applicant | FR2668774 |