blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0686686

EP0686686 - Furnace for the thermal treatment of waste and process therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Français du Pétrole
4, Avenue de Bois Préau
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE
4, Avenue de Bois Préau
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE
4, Avenue de Bois Préau
F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Martin, Gérard
34bis, avenue de Colmar
F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
02 / Marty, Eric
3, rue de la réunion
F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
03 / Minkkinen, Ari
6, rue Les Paulownias
F-78860 Saint-Nom-La Breteche / FR
[1995/50]
Application number, filing date95401182.122.05.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateFR1994000722010.06.1994         Original published format: FR 9407220
[1995/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686686
Date:13.12.1995
Language:FR
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686686
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.1995
ClassificationIPC:C10B1/10, F27B7/08
[1995/50]
CPC:
C10B47/30 (EP,US); C10B1/10 (EP,US); F27B7/08 (EP,US);
H05B6/6435 (EP,US); H05B6/6458 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Ofen zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfällen und Verfahren[1995/50]
English:Furnace for the thermal treatment of waste and process therefor[1995/50]
French:Four de traitement thermique de déchets et procédé associé[1995/50]
Examination procedure13.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2166516  (NIKITENKO GRIGORY, et al);
 [A]EP0022214  (BABCOCK KRAUSS MAFFEI IND [DE])[A] 3,11;
 [X]US4301750  (FIO RITO WILLIAM M, et al) [X] 1,2,6-10 * figures 1-5; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3741623  (SALZGITTER AG [DE]);
 [A]GB2212797  (STELLA SPA [IT])
by applicantFR2668774
 FR19940006660
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.