EP0689031 - Procedure and device to apply a line of adhesive on a panel, such as a windscreen of a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villotta, Hervé 6, rue Boileau, Appartement 452 F-92140 Clamart / FR | 02 /
Loulier, Georges 11, rue d'Aquitaine F-91850 Bouray sur Juine / FR | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel, et al Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Thinat, Michel, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 20 Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401253.0 | 30.05.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | FR19940007835 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9407835 | [1995/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689031 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, B60J1/00, B05C5/02 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B05C5/0216 (EP);
G01B11/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1995/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anbringen eines Leimstreifens auf einer Scheibe sowie einer Fahrzeugscheibe | [1995/52] | English: | Procedure and device to apply a line of adhesive on a panel, such as a windscreen of a car | [1995/52] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la pose d'un cordon de colle sur un panneau, tel qu'une vitre de véhicule automobile | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/07] | 02.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0599126 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,18 * titre *; column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 42; figure 1 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 27; figure 3 * * column 8, line 48 - column 12, line 10; figures 4-6 *; | [X]JPS62215806 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880310), vol. 12, no. 76, Database accession no. (P - 675), & JP62215806 A 19870922 (KOMATSU MASANOBU) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2696556 |