EP0689957 - Element for backrest frame for seats especially vehicle seats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CESA COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE SIEGES POUR AUTOMOBILES 20, rue Paul Vaillant-Couturier 92307 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR | [1998/11] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states CESA COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE SIEGES POUR AUTOMOBILES 20, rue Paul Vaillant-Couturier F-92307 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanke, Philippe 65 avenue Georges Bannery F-45290 Nogent sur Vernisson / FR | 02 /
Guillemard, Philippe 65 avenue Georges Bannery F-45290 Nogent sur Vernisson / FR | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401345.4 | 09.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | FR19940007956 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9407956 | [1996/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689957 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689957 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
B60R22/26 (EP);
B60N2/688 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Rahmenelement für Sitzrückenlehne insbesondere Fahrzeugsitzrückenlehne | [1996/01] | English: | Element for backrest frame for seats especially vehicle seats | [1996/01] | French: | Elément pour armature de dossier de siège notamment de véhicule | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0435740 (FAURE BERTRAND AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [Y] 1,6 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 5; figures 3,4,7 *; | [Y]EP0102708 (HAWTAL WHITING DESIGN & ENG [GB]) [Y] 1,6 * page 5, line 21 - line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4309301 (ARACO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3636912 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]); | [A]US5253924 (GLANCE PATRICK M [US]) |