EP0687830 - Elastic bending articulation, especially for a support arm of a wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Opposition rejected | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunerye, Philippe 13 Rue de la Gaucherie F-18100 Vierzon / FR | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401369.4 | 13.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | FR19940007312 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9407312 | [1995/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687830 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687830 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/387 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B60G7/02 (EP);
F16F1/387 (EP);
B60G2204/41042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1995/51] | Title | German: | Elastisches Kippgelenk, insbesondere für eine Einarmschwinge von Rädern | [1995/51] | English: | Elastic bending articulation, especially for a support arm of a wheel | [1995/51] | French: | Articulation élastique autobraqueuse, en particulier pour bras-support de roue oscillant | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.1998
12.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lemförder Metallwaren AG Postfach 1220 49441 Lemförde / DE Opponent's representative Brandt, Detlef Meisenstrasse 96 33607 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.1998
12.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lemförder Metallwaren AG Postfach 1220 49441 Lemförde / DE Opponent's representative Brandt, Detlef (DE) Meisenstrasse 96 D-33607 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [1998/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.1998
12.08.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lemförder Metallwaren AG Postfach 1220 49441 Lemförde / DE | 14.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.07.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/36] | 12.07.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4126184 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,9,10 * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 18; figures 6,7 *; | [A]EP0147662 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3240981 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 8 * figures 2,3; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0499996 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3223752 (FORD WERKE AG) |