EP0690041 - Process for the preparation of diacetyl free methylmethalcrylate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/01] | Process for the preparation of diacethyl free methylmethalcrylate | ||
[1998/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Croizy, Jean-François 84, rue Principale F-75450 Farschivller / FR | 02 /
Esch, Marc 23, rue Goethe F-57800 Freyming-Merlebach / FR | [1996/01] | Application number, filing date | 95401430.4 | 19.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | FR19940008103 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9408103 | [1996/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690041 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690041 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/54, C07C69/54, C07C67/62, C07C67/20 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
C07C67/54 (EP,US);
C07C69/54 (KR);
C07C67/48 (KR);
C07C67/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/54, C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C67/60, C07C69/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Methylmethacrylat ohne Diacethyl | [1996/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of diacetyl free methylmethalcrylate | [1998/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de méthacrylate de méthyle sans diacétyle | [1996/01] |
Former [1996/01] | Process for the preparation of diacethyl free methylmethalcrylate | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0206230 (DU PONT [US])[DA] 1 |