blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0694974

EP0694974 - Photosensor and method for forming the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takakura, Shinji
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date95401491.623.06.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateJP1994017183830.06.1994         Original published format: JP 17183894
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0694974
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0694974
Date:15.05.1996
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0694974
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/144, H01L31/103
[1996/05]
CPC:
H10F39/107 (EP,US); H10F30/20 (KR); H10F30/221 (EP,US);
H10F39/103 (EP,US); H10F77/14 (EP,US); H10F99/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Photosensor und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1996/05]
English:Photosensor and method for forming the same[1996/05]
French:Dispositif photosensible et son procédé de fabrication[1996/05]
Examination procedure25.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
09.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2001Fee for grant paid
26.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS63122267  ;
 [X]JPS6097681  ;
 [Y]US4837429  (UMEZAWA ISAO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.