Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0696557
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.10.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
12.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
20.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.10.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.01.1998 |
First examination report |
|
15.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] |
05.07.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] |
08.01.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] |