blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0696557

EP0696557 - Grinding agent for cement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2000
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2000 [2000/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIMENTS FRANCAIS
Tour Ariane, Quartier Villon, 5 Place de la Pyramide
F-92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/07]For all designated states
CIMENTS FRANCAIS
Tour Ariane, Quartier Villon, 5 Place de la Pyramide
F-92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Briat, Jean
18, rue de la Croisette
F-27950 St. Marcel / FR
02 / Fontaine, Catherine
10 Chemin Vert
F-78240 Chambourcy / FR
[1996/07]
Representative(s)Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/07]Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date95401541.828.06.1995
[1996/07]
Priority number, dateFR1994000871513.07.1994         Original published format: FR 9408715
[1996/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0696557
Date:14.02.1996
[1996/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0696557
Date:21.08.1996
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0696557
Date:29.12.1999
Language:FR
[1999/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1996
ClassificationIPC:C04B24/10, C04B24/38, C04B28/08, B02C23/06, // (C04B28/08, 24:10),(C04B28/08, 24:38),(C04B28/08, 24:06)
[1996/34]
CPC:
C04B24/06 (EP,US); B02C23/06 (EP,US); C04B24/10 (EP,US);
C04B24/38 (EP,US); C04B28/08 (EP,US); C04B2103/52 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C04B28/08, C04B24/06 (US,EP);
C04B28/08, C04B24/10 (US,EP);
C04B28/08, C04B24/38 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1996/07]C04B24/10, C04B24/38, C04B28/08, B02C23/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1996/07]
TitleGerman:Mahlhilfsmittel für Zement[1996/07]
English:Grinding agent for cement[1996/07]
French:Agent de mouture pour ciments[1996/07]
Examination procedure08.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/39]
20.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.1999Fee for grant paid
10.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]SU1578106  ;
 [X]GB191413542  (GODDARD JOSEPH FREEMAN [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 20 - line 37 * * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 2; claim 1 *;
 [XA]GB208370  (ARTHUR ALLTREE) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 52 - page 2, line 29; claim 1 * [A] 8;
 [A]GB424110  (ARTHUR FREDRIK ECHBERG) [A] 1,4,8* page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 18; claims 1,2,5 *;
 [X]US2480020  (WILLIAM HELMS) [X] 1,3,8 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 45 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE2455005  (ICI LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 14 * * page 6, line 4 - line 13 * * example 1; claims 1,2,5,6,8,10 *;
 [DY]DE2707677  (KAO CORP) [DY] 4,7 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 3; claims 1-3 * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 8; table 1 *;
 [XY]US4375987  (LANGE BRUCE A, et al) [X] 1 * column A; claims 1,6,9,14,15 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 21; example 5 * [Y] 5;
 [DY]EP0232202  (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [DY] 2,3,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 28 * * example 6; table 3 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, (19900715), vol. 91, no. 22, Database accession no. 91-162197, XP002005640 & SU1578106 A1 19900715 (CONS. PROD. RES. INST.) [X] 1 * abstract *
Examination   - J.FALBE ET ALL, Römpp Chemie Lexicon, p. 4452-4453, STUTGART-NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, 9. ED.
by applicantFR1425822
 US4073658
 US4423801
 FR2597473
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.