EP0698433 - Twin roll casting machine with applied side walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USINOR Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states USINOR Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states USINOR Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7 - 11/13 cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 D-47166 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states USINOR SACILOR Société Anonyme 4, Place de la Pyramide, la Défense 9 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 D-47166 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbe, Jacques 9, rue des Trois Meules F-42100 Saint Etienne / FR | 02 /
Vendeville, Luc 32, rue Edgard Quinet F-62400 Bethune / FR | 03 /
Delassus, Pierre 267, rue du Cornet Malo, Locon F-62400 Bethune / FR | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger, et al TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR) Immeuble "La Pacific" 11/13 Cours Valmy La Défense 7 TSA 10001 92070 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Ventavoli, Roger, et al TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR), Immeuble " La Pacific " 11/13 Cours Valmy La Défense 7, TSA 10001 92070 Paris La Défense Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/09] | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR SACILOR), Immeuble " La Pacific ", 11/13 Cours Valmy - La Défense 7, TSA 10001 F-92070 Paris La Défense Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401560.8 | 29.06.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | FR19940008319 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9408319 | [1996/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698433 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698433 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
B22D11/0405 (EP,US);
B22D11/00 (KR);
B22D11/066 (EP,US);
B27J1/02 (EP,US);
D04C1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | Doppelroll Stanggiessmaschine mit angedrückten Seitenwände | [1996/09] | English: | Twin roll casting machine with applied side walls | [1996/09] | French: | Dispositif de coulée continue entre cylindres à parois d'obturation latérale appliquées | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6326243 ; | [X]JPS579565 ; | [A]JPH0199749 ; | [Y]EP0212423 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 6, line 27 - line 38; figures 3,4 *; | [DA]EP0546206 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0556657 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,2 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880629), vol. 12, no. 229, Database accession no. (M - 714), & JP63026243 A 19880203 (NIPPON YAKIN KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 4,5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820430), vol. 6, no. 69, Database accession no. (M - 125), & JP57009565 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890714), vol. 13, no. 310, Database accession no. (M - 850), & JP01099749 A 19890418 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0546206 |