EP0698741 - Screw with caged head for blind mounting, for example in the opening of a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAPID S.A. 251 Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1996/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leon, Jean-Pierre 41, Avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-78000 Houilles / FR | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/09] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401588.9 | 30.06.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | FR19940008862 | 18.07.1994 Original published format: FR 9408862 | [1996/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698741 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698741 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B35/06 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
F16B37/042 (EP);
F16B37/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1996/09] | Title | German: | Schraube mit einem von einem Käfig umschlossenen Kopf zur Befestigung z.B. in der Öffnung einer Platte | [1996/09] | English: | Screw with caged head for blind mounting, for example in the opening of a panel | [1996/09] | French: | Vis à tête encagée pour montage en aveugle dans l'ouverture d'un panneau par exemple | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2544410 (RAPID SA [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2839165 (DE GASSO JOHN) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB687618 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2867258 (FLORA LAURENCE H, et al) [A] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]US2381233 (MILLS SUMMERS J) [A] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]DE9402403U (VOIGT MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 6 * the whole document * |