EP0694814 - Apparatus and method for processing imaging materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newman, Norman, c/o M. M. & M. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Izzi, Guglielmo, c/o M. M. & M. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Leonard, Mark T., c/o 3M United Kingdom PLC Minnesota 3M Research Ltd., Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 5AE / GB | 04 /
Desai, Basavaraj D., c/o Pic.Prod.Ltd.Part. 9944 Delle Meade Drive US-Knoxville Tennessee 37931 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401769.5 | 26.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19940281469 | 27.07.1994 Original published format: US 281469 | US19950487923 | 11.07.1995 Original published format: US 487923 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694814 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03D3/06 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G03D3/065 (EP);
G03D3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1996/05] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Behandeln von Bildaufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1996/05] | English: | Apparatus and method for processing imaging materials | [1996/05] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traitement de matériaux pour l'enregistrement d'images | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 01.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/30] | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US5043756 (TAKABAYASHI NAOKI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3,5 * column 21, line 38 - line 56; figure 22 * [Y] 4,7; | [YA]WO9207301 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * [A] 1,3,5; | [Y]JPH05546749 ; | [A]EP0530889 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, line 16 - line 17; figure 1 * * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800613), vol. 4, no. 82, Database accession no. (P - 015), & JP5546749 A 19800402 (MITSUBISHI) [Y] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | US5168296 | WO9300612 | EP0410322 | US5266994 | US5043756 | US5136323 | US5365299 |