EP0710924 - IC card with light indicator for ascertaining the proper functioning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/40] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robin, Philippe Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Dubois, Jean-Claude Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 03 /
Facoetti, Hugues Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 04 /
Riguidel, Christian Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 05 /
Paschal, Jean-Pierre Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402060.8 | 12.09.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | FR19940011072 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: FR 9411072 | [1996/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710924 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
G06K19/0704 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
G06K19/0739 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06K19/07758 (EP,US);
G06K19/07798 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1996/19] | Title | German: | IC-Karte mit Leuchtanzeige zur Feststellung der Funktionsfähigkeit | [1996/19] | English: | IC card with light indicator for ascertaining the proper functioning | [1996/19] | French: | Carte électronique avec voyant de bon fonctionnement | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/41] | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03221493 ; | [XAY]GB2151987 (HICKIE CHRISTOPHER JOHN) [X] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document * [A] 14 [Y] 9; | [A]FR2680905 (ESCOFFIER GENTILE PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 13* abstract *; | [Y]EP0560470 (OXLEY DEV CO LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [DA]FR2691813 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [DA] 9,14 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911220), vol. 15, no. 505, Database accession no. (M - 1194), & JP03221493 A 19910930 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * |