EP0703638 - Method and device for enlragement of the radiation diagram for an active antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2000/29] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcy, Jean-Pierre THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Roger, Joseph THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402101.0 | 19.09.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | FR19940011377 | 23.09.1994 Original published format: FR 9411377 | [1996/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703638 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703638 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q25/00, H01Q21/22, H01Q3/36 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
H01Q3/36 (EP,US);
H01Q21/22 (EP,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbreiterung des Strahlungsdiagramms einer aktiven Antenne | [1996/13] | English: | Method and device for enlragement of the radiation diagram for an active antenna | [1996/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'élargissement du diagramme de rayonnement d'une antenne active | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DUFORT, "Low Sidelobe Electronically Scanned Antenna Using Identical Transmit/Receive Modules", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, NEW YORK US, vol. 36, no. 3, pages 349 - 356, XP001382412 [A] 1,4 * page 349, paragraph I - page 352, paragraph III; figures 1,2 * | [A] - HALL ET AL., "Integrated Multiple Beam Microstrip Arrays", MICROWAVE JOURNAL, DEDHAM US, vol. 35, no. 1, pages 103 - 114, XP000297304 [A] 1,4 * page 103 - page 111; figures 1-6,10 * | [A] - MAILLOUX, "Antenna Array Architecture", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK US, vol. 80, no. 1, pages 163 - 172, XP000294639 [A] 1,4 * page 163, paragraph I - page 167, paragraph IV; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.119575 |