EP0709356 - Catalytic composition and aliphatic hydrocarbon alkylation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauvin, Yves 64 Avenue du Général Leclerc F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | 02 /
Hirschauer, André 25, rue Emile Zola F-78360 Montesson / FR | 03 /
Olivier, Hélène 9, place des Impressionnistes F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [1996/19] |
Former [1996/18] | 01 /
Chauvin, Yves 64 Avenue du Général Leclerc F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | ||
02 /
Hirschauer, André 25, rue Emile Zola F-78360 Montesson / FR | |||
03 /
Olivier, Hélène 72, avenue de la République F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402310.7 | 17.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | FR19940012778 | 24.10.1994 Original published format: FR 9412778 | [1996/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709356 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709356 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/60, B01J31/02 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07C2/60 (EP,US);
B01J27/122 (EP,US);
B01J31/0284 (EP,US);
B01J31/26 (EP,US);
B01J31/30 (EP,US);
B01J2231/321 (EP,US);
C07C2527/08 (EP,US);
C07C2527/10 (EP,US);
C07C2527/122 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Katalytische Zusammenstellung und Verfahren für die Alkylierung von aliphatische Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1996/18] | English: | Catalytic composition and aliphatic hydrocarbon alkylation process | [1996/18] | French: | Composition catalytique et procédé pour l'alkylation d'hydrocarbures aliphatiques | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0488073 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1,6,8-12 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 44 - line 50 * [Y] 5,20-22; | [Y]EP0553009 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 5,20-22 * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 36 *; | [A]EP0576323 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]WO9116283 (OLAH GEORGE A [US]) |