EP0711093 - Switching system for optical packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillemot, Christian 65 Boulevard de la Corniche F-22700 Perros-Guirec / FR | 02 /
Loualiche, Slimane 46 E, Cours de la Vilaine F-35510 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 03 /
Clerot, Fabrice Le Colven F-22700 Louannec / FR | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Le Forestier, Eric Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402434.5 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | FR19940013202 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9413202 | [1996/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711093 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711093 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L12/56 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/106 (EP,US);
H04L49/1553 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5605 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0011 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0013 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0015 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/002 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0022 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0039 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0052 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/19] | Title | German: | Vermittlungssystem für optische Pakete | [1996/19] | English: | Switching system for optical packets | [1996/19] | French: | Système de commutateur pour paquets optiques | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0568048 ; | [A]US5101455 (GOUTZOULIS ANASTASIOS P [US]) [A] 1,4-10,13-22,24,26-29,36 * column A * * column 5, line 16 - line 45 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]FR2672172 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [DA] 1-30 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0503464 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]); | [XY]EP0547836 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-12,17,24-27 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 15 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 47 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 30,31; | [X] - HAAS, "Growability of the "Staggering Switch" architecture", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS '93, GENÈVE CH, (19930523), vol. 1, pages 578 - 583, XP000371156 [X] 1,2,5,7-12,17,21-28 * page 578, column L, line 1 - page 580, column L, line 7 * * page 582, column L, line 11 - line 36 * * figures 1-3,5,9 * | [YA] - MURAKAMI ET AL., "Overview of photonic switching systems using time-division and wavelength-division multiplexing", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, TOKYO JP, vol. E77-B, no. 2, pages 119 - 127, XP000447102 [Y] 30 * page 121, column R, line 6 - line 20 * * page 123, column L, line 20 - line 32 * * figures 3,11 * [A] 1-20 | [YA] - SHARONY ET AL., "Extension of classical rearrangeable and non-blocking networks to the wavelength dimension", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE/GLOBECOM '92, ORLANDO US, (19921206), vol. 3, pages 1901 - 1905, XP000392891 [Y] 31 * page 1903, column L, line 9 - column R, line 20 * * figure 4 * [A] 1,2,7,8,11-16 | [A] - MASETTI ET AL., "Optical fiber buffer for high-performance broadband switching", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, MILANO IT, vol. 4, no. 6, pages 671 - 679, XP000433724 [A] 1,5-20,24-28,36 * abstract * * page 673, column L, line 5 - column R, line 6 * * figures 1-7 * | [A] - CISNEROS ET AL., "A large ATM switch based on memory switches and optical star couplers", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, DENVER US, (19910623), vol. 2, pages 721 - 728, XP000269589 [A] 1-3,7-16,31-35,37-43 * abstract * * page 721, column L, line 40 - column R, line 16 * * figure 1 * | [A] - TSUKADA ET AL., "Ultrafast photonic ATM switch based on time-division broadcast-and-select network", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE/GLOBECOM '91, PHOENIX US, (19911202), vol. 2, pages 1230 - 1234, XP000332854 [A] 1-43 * page 1231, column L, line 5 - page 1233, column L, line 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930720), vol. 17, no. 386, Database accession no. (E - 1401), & JP568048 A 19930319 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1,5-20,24-28 * abstract * |