EP0711941 - Hand lever with insertable stop for a filling cock on a gas heating boiler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAUNIER DUVAL EAU CHAUDE CHAUFFAGE S.D.E.C.C. - Société anonyme "Le Technipole", 8 avenue Pablo Picasso F-94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states SAUNIER DUVAL EAU CHAUDE CHAUFFAGE S.D.E.C.C. - Société anonyme "Le Technipole", 8 avenue Pablo Picasso F-94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helias, Luc 6, rue de Brest F-44300 Nantes / FR | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Lhuillier, René, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402480.8 | 07.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | FR19940013567 | 10.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9413567 | [1996/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711941 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711941 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/08 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
F24D3/1083 (EP);
F16K27/06 (EP);
F24D3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1996/20] | Title | German: | Handgriff mit einsteckbarem Anschlag für einen Füllhahn an einem Gasheizkessel | [1996/20] | English: | Hand lever with insertable stop for a filling cock on a gas heating boiler | [1996/20] | French: | Manette à butée escamotable pour la robinetterie du dispositif de remplissage d'une chaudière à gaz | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2000 | GB | 07.06.2000 | NL | 07.06.2000 | DE | 08.09.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/13] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
GB | 07.06.2000 | ||
DE | 08.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 07.06.2000 | |
GB | 07.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 07.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1628263 (MOORE FRANK W) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]CH178675 (LE REVE SA [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]FR1077909 (ROSIERES USINES) [A] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE1697754U (MUELLER AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 3 * |