EP0719850 - Process and apparatus for the stripping of fluidized solids and use in a fluidized cracking process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [1996/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senegas, Marie-Andrée Le Bosc Renoud, St Etienne l'Allier F-27450 St Georges du Vievre / FR | 02 /
Selem, Philippe 17, Impasse Eric Sati F-76290 Montivilliers / FR | 03 /
Patureaux, Thierry 10, Rue des Frènes F-76290 Fontaine la Mallet / FR | 04 /
Mauleon, Jean-Louis La Mare Asse F-27500 Ste Croix sur Aizier / FR | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402516.9 | 10.11.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | FR19940015856 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415856 | [1996/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719850 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719850 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,KR,US);
A01G9/00 (KR);
B01J19/32 (EP,US);
B01J8/34 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3221 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Strippung von suspendierten Feststoffen und Anwendung in Fliesskrackverfahren | [1996/27] | English: | Process and apparatus for the stripping of fluidized solids and use in a fluidized cracking process | [1996/27] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le strippage de solides fluidisés, et utilisation dans un procédé de craquage à l'état fluide | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.1999 | GR | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | LU | 10.11.1999 | CH | 30.11.1999 | LI | 30.11.1999 | DK | 15.12.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GR | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GR | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
GR | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 15.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2472502 (TYSON CHARLES W); | [DA]US2481439 (OGORZALY HENRY J) |