blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0713124

EP0713124 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.2003  [2003/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukumoto, Hirohide, c/o Sony Kokubu Semiconductor
Corp., 982 Aza Daimaru, Noguchi
Kokubu-shi, Kagoshima-ken / JP
02 / Ushirono, Junichi, c/o Sony Kokubu Semiconductor
Corp., 982 Aza Daimaru, Noguchi
Kokubu-shi, Kagoshima-ken / JP
03 / Nakano, Minoru, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Kataoka, Hideo, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date95402553.215.11.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateJP1994030703315.11.1994         Original published format: JP 30703394
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0713124
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0713124
Date:18.12.1996
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713124
Date:06.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1996
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/1337
[1996/21]
CPC:
G02F1/1337 (EP,KR,US); G02F1/133371 (KR); G02F1/133509 (KR);
G02F1/133609 (KR); G02F1/13373 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung[1996/21]
English:Liquid crystal display device[1996/21]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide[1996/21]
Examination procedure28.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
30.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2001Fee for grant paid
05.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5309263  (SATO MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 34 - line 64; figure 3 * * column 6, line 14 - line 59; figure 2 * * column 2, line 01 - line 19 *;
 [XY]EP0601813  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 3, line 11 - line 47 * * page 11, line 05 - line 10 * * page 20, line 23 - line 24 * * page 22, line 09 - line 22 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]JPH0444012  ;
 [X]EP0449047  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 29 - line 33 * * page 4, line 40 - line 41; figure 14 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 16, no. 220, Database accession no. (P - 1358), & JP04044012 A 00000000 (NEC) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *
 [Y]  - "NEW HYBRID ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR ACTIVE MATRIX LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19931201), vol. 36, no. 12, page 571/572, XP000419070 [Y] 4 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.