EP0718559 - Fuel distribution system for the injection heads of a double annular combustor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ansart, Denis R.H. 6 Impasse des Cerfs F-77590 Bois le Roi / FR | 02 /
Sandelis, Denis J.M. 1 A. Dubois F-77370 Nangis / FR | 03 /
Quinqueneau, Bruno M 2 allée des Helvetes F-91300 Massy / FR | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 95402625.8 | 22.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940014013 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9414013 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718559 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718559 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
F23R3/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/26] | Title | German: | Brennstoffverteilungssystem für die Einspritzköpfe einer Doppelringbrennkammer | [1996/26] | English: | Fuel distribution system for the injection heads of a double annular combustor | [1996/26] | French: | Système d'injection d'une chambre de combustion à deux têtes | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0527629 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4499735 (MOORE GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5289685 (HOFFA ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5319919 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2174147 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4292801 (WILKES COLIN, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4735052 (MAEDA FUKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0399336 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | by applicant | GB2214630 | FR2421342 |