Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0718560
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.11.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
19.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] |
09.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.10.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.07.1998 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.11.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |
10.05.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |