EP0718560 - Staged combustor where full load injectors also containing idling injectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alary, Jean-Paul D. 51, rue Ledru Rollin F-94100 St. Maur des Fosses / FR | 02 /
Salan, Yves F.A. 14, rue Mistral F-91600 Savigny s/Orge / FR | 03 /
Ansart, Denis R.H. 6, allée des Cerfs F-77590 Bois le Roi / FR | 04 /
Sandelis, Denis J.M. 1 A. Dubois F-77370 Nangis / FR | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 95402626.6 | 22.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940014014 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9414014 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718560 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718560 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34, F23R3/50, F23R3/10 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
F23R3/10 (EP,US);
F23R3/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/26] | Title | German: | Stufenbrennkammer, deren Vollastbrenner auch Leerlaufbrenner enthalten | [1996/26] | English: | Staged combustor where full load injectors also containing idling injectors | [1996/26] | French: | Chambre de combustion à deux têtes fonctionnant du ralenti au plein gaz | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 22.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4012904 (NOGLE THOMAS DUSHANE) [A] 2,3 * column 11, line 27 - line 32; figure 11 *; | [A]GB2003554 (SNECMA) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 55 * * page 3, line 109 - page 4, line 39; figure . *; | [A]GB2010408 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2030653 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 107 - line 120; figure 3 * * page 3, line 83 - line 96 *; | [Y]US4292801 (WILKES COLIN, et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 7, line 2 - line 20; figure 8 *; | [A]WO9325851 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XY]GB2269449 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 2, lines 11-12 * * figure - * * page 4, paragraph 7 * * page 2, lines 15-17 * [Y] 2,3,5; | [A]US5323604 (EKSTEDT EDWARD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 8 * |