EP0713964 - Intane device for supercharged internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite: REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT 34, quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite: REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT 34, quai du Point du Jour F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rivere, Jean-Pierre 197, avenue de Versailles F-75016 Paris / FR | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Fernandez, Francis Lionel, et al Renault Technocentre S.0267 - TCR AVA 0-56 1 avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Fernandez, Francis Lionel, et al Régie Nationale des Usines Renault SA Service 0267 - Bâtiment J2 860, Quai de Stalingrad B.P. 103 F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402657.1 | 24.11.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | FR19940014136 | 25.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9414136 | [1996/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713964 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/10, F02B33/44, F02B37/12 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
F02M35/10163 (EP,US);
F02B33/446 (EP);
F02F1/4214 (EP);
F02M35/108 (EP,US);
F02M35/1085 (EP,US);
F02M35/112 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/22] | Title | German: | Ansaugvorrichtung für aufgeladene Brennkraftmaschine | [1996/22] | English: | Intane device for supercharged internal combustion engines | [1996/22] | French: | Dispositif d'admission pour moteur à combustion interne suralimenté | [1996/22] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4774812 (HITOMI MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 11 - line 26 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 29; figure 1 * * column 7, line 14 - line 20; figure 8 * [Y] 4,8; | [YA]DE3212910 (TOYO KOGYO CO [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 3; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [Y]US4512153 (KAWABATA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 42 - line 49 *; | [A]DE3639090 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 61; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4628880 |