EP0716265 - Device for the burning of solid products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNIX 620 Avenue de Montignac 16100 Merpins / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states TECHNIX 620 Avenue de Montignac F-16100 Merpins / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aime, Bruno 13, rue des Charmilles F-86340 Les Roches Presmarie / FR | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402731.4 | 04.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | FR19940014650 | 06.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9414650 | [1996/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716265 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23H3/02, F23H5/00, F23G5/24 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
F23H3/02 (EP);
F23G5/245 (EP);
F23H5/00 (EP);
F23L5/02 (EP);
F23M5/085 (EP);
F24H1/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verbrennung fester Stoffe | [1996/24] | English: | Device for the burning of solid products | [1996/24] | French: | Dispositif pour brûler des produits solides | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/49] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1998 | 31.12.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2159938 (DOULTON IND PRODUCTS LTD) [X] 1,3-6,11,20 * page 2, line 124 - page 3, line 22 * * page 3, line 39 - page 3, line 54 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US1701613 (ALEXANDROVITCH GOLOVTCHIKOFF A) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 6 * * page 1, line 43 - page 1, line 46 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US1558683 (LENK GUS F) [A] 7,10 * page 2, line 75 - page 2, line 89 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB143796 (ERNEST PICKARD) [A] 7,10 * page 2, line 18 - page 2, line 36 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB191324923 (THOMAS JOHN) [A] 11,12,16,17 * & GB-A-24923 A.D. 1913 * * page 4, line 30 - page 4, line 56 * * figure 1 * |