EP0722010 - Process for bleaching a micronized vegetable powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Devic, Michel 27, Chemin des Fonds F-69110 Sainte Foy les Lyon / FR | [1996/29] | Application number, filing date | 95402756.1 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | FR19950000093 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: FR 9500093 | [1996/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722010 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/02, D21C9/16 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
D21C9/163 (EP);
D21H17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, MC, PT, SE [1996/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bleichung von mikronisiertem pflanzlichem Pulver | [1996/29] | English: | Process for bleaching a micronized vegetable powder | [1996/29] | French: | Procédé de blanchiment d'une poudre végétale micronisée | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/34] | 31.03.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2199376 (REICHERT JOSEPH S, et al) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [AD]WO9015900 (GOMEZ DANIEL [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0419385 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US5069919 (WEIBEL A THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US5332474 (MAXHAM JOHN V [US]) [A] 1-14* column W * |