Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3287384B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2002 | B2 | JPH08234466 | 13.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | JP33653795 | 25.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0720061 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2000 | B1 | EP0720061 | 30.07.1997 | A3 | EP0720061 | 03.07.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1085353C | 22.05.2002 | C | CN1151038 | 04.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69519558T | 31.05.2001 | T2 | DE69519558D1 | 11.01.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0173511B | 01.04.1999 | B1 | KR960024710 | 20.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW311187B | 21.07.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5604061 | 18.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32793294 | 28.12.1994 |