EP0724028 - Method for the preparation of wire-formed silicon crystal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Tsuguo 2-6-7, Nijino-oka, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kamioka, Tadashi c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakaguchi, Susumu c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co, Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Toru c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kirasawa, Teruhiko c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [1996/31] | Application number, filing date | 95402952.6 | 27.12.1995 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | JP19940325903 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32590394 | JP19940326012 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32601294 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0724028 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0724028 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/00, C30B29/06, C30B13/00 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
C30B13/00 (EP,US);
C30B15/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | C30B15/00, C30B29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung drahtförmigen Silizium ein Kristalles | [1996/31] | English: | Method for the preparation of wire-formed silicon crystal | [1996/31] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un monocristal de silicium sous forme de fil | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ZULEHNER W, "STATUS AND FUTURE OF SILICON CRYSTAL GROWTH", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, (19891001), vol. B04, no. 1/04, pages 1 - 10, XP000095483 [A] 1-19 * page 3 - page 4; figure 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5107(89)90207-9 |