blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0671260

EP0671260 - Method for engraving a gravure cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.09.1998
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.11.1998 [1998/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/37]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Walters, David W., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Lobo, Rukmini B., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
[1995/37]
Representative(s)Buff, Michel, et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/37]Buff, Michel, et al
Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle
F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date95420038.220.02.1995
[1995/37]
Priority number, dateUS1994020173425.02.1994         Original published format: US 201734
[1995/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0671260
Date:13.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0671260
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.1995
ClassificationIPC:B41C1/04
[1995/37]
CPC:
B41C1/045 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gravierung eines gravierten Zylinders[1995/37]
English:Method for engraving a gravure cylinder[1995/37]
French:Procédé de gravure d'un cylindre gravé[1995/37]
Examination procedure15.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/15]
27.01.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.1997Fee for grant paid
28.07.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1529590  (LEATHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.