EP0720967 - Metallurgical silicon and ferrosilicon of low oxygen content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY ELECTROMETALLURGIE Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 6 Place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states PECHINEY ELECTROMETALLURGIE Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 6 Place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states PECHINEY ELECTROMETALLURGIE Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 6 Place de l'Iris F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sales, Maurice 12, Rue Paquier F-74000 Annecy / FR | 02 /
Margaria, Thomas 73, Avenue du Mont Blanc F-74190 Chedde Passy / FR | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95420365.9 | 21.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | FR19950000330 | 09.01.1995 Original published format: FR 9500330 | [1996/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720967 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720967 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/037, C07F7/16, C22C35/00, C22C1/02 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
C07F7/16 (EP,US);
C01B33/037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [1996/28] | Title | German: | Metallurgisches Silizium und Ferrosilizium mit niedrigem Sauerstoffgehalt | [1998/17] | English: | Metallurgical silicon and ferrosilicon of low oxygen content | [1996/28] | French: | Silicium et ferrosilicium métallurgique à basse teneur en oxygène | [1996/28] |
Former [1996/28] | Metallurgische Silizium und Ferrosilicium mit niedrigem Sauerstoffgehalt | Examination procedure | 30.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1169508 (UNION CARBIDE LTD) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3405613 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8,9 * claims 1,2 * * page 3, line 1 *; | [A]DE3223821 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8 * claim 1 *; | [DPA]FR2709082 (PECHINEY ELECTROMETALLURGIE [FR]) [DPA] 1 * claim 12 * * claims 1,6-9 * [PA] 8,11 | [DA] - M. FILIPOVICH ET AL., Symposium International de la Production des Ferroalliages et du Silicium cristallisé. Sibenik (Yougoslavie), 17-21 septembre 1975 [DA] 8 * page 1 - page 21 * * page 13 - page 14, paragraph 6 * |