blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0712612

EP0712612 - Endodontic instrument adaptable on a vibrating handpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.1999
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICRO MEGA INTERNATIONAL MANUFACTURES (Société Anonyme)
5 rue du Tunnel
25000 Besançon / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
MICRO MEGA INTERNATIONAL MANUFACTURES (Société Anonyme)
5 rue du Tunnel
F-25000 Besancon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Badoz, Jean-Marie
42 rue de la Chaussée
F-25300 Pontarlier / FR
02 / Calas, Paul
19 Avenue Foch
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
03 / Vulcain, Jean-Marie
8 Impasse Ste Croix
F-35500 Vitre / FR
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Poupon, Michel
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois
17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Poupon, Michel
Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR
Former [1996/21]Poupon, Michel
Cabinet Michel Poupon, 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot, B.P. 421
F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date95470036.526.10.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateFR1994001405821.11.1994         Original published format: FR 9414058
[1996/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0712612
Date:22.05.1996
Language:FR
[1996/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0712612
Date:29.05.1996
[1996/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.1996
ClassificationIPC:A61C5/02, A61C3/03
[1996/21]
CPC:
A61C3/03 (EP,US); A61C5/42 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Ein an ein vibrierendes Handstück anpassbares endodontisches Instrument[1996/21]
English:Endodontic instrument adaptable on a vibrating handpiece[1996/21]
French:Instrument endodontique adaptable sur une pièce à main vibrante[1996/21]
Examination procedure29.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
01.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/44]
04.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1999/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199804   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8605967  (GOOF SVEN KARL LENNART) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0330173  (LEVY GUY) [A] 1,3* column 4, line 12 - line 44; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9416640  (DELMON ANSTALT [LI], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2575950
 US5320530
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.