EP0718954 - System for remote reading of electricity meters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Van Suu, Maurice, Cabinet Ballot Schmit 18 Place du Forum F-57000 Metz / FR | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 8 Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | ||
Former [1996/26] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 18 Place du Forum 57000 Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 95470042.3 | 01.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940015538 | 19.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415538 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718954 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, H04Q9/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H02J13/00007 (EP);
H04Q2209/40 (EP);
H04Q2209/60 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S40/121 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/26] | Title | German: | System zur Fernablesung von Elektrizitätszählern | [1996/26] | English: | System for remote reading of electricity meters | [1996/26] | French: | Système de télérelevé de compteurs électriques | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 09.12.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/42] | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3656112 (PAULL STEPHEN) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3702460 (BLOSE JOHN B) [A] 1* column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 67; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3900842 (CALABRO SALVATORE R, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 7 - line 65; figure 1 * |