EP0706117 - Non-restoring fixed-point divider apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsay, Albert Suan-Wei 8107 Wolf Jaw Cove Austin, Texas 79729 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain IBM France Intellectual Property Dept. Le Plan du bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | de Pena, Alain IBM France Intellectual Property Dept. Le Plan du bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1998/45] | Therias, Philippe Compagnie IBM FRANCE, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1996/15] | Schuffenecker, Thierry Compagnie IBM France, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 95480123.9 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/15] | Priority number, date | US19940319203 | 05.10.1994 Original published format: US 319203 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706117 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706117 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/52 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
G06F7/535 (EP,US);
G06F7/52 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (KR);
G06F2207/5352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/15] | Title | German: | Festkomma-Dividiervorrichtung ohne Rückstellung | [1996/15] | English: | Non-restoring fixed-point divider apparatus | [1996/15] | French: | Dispositif de division non-restituant à virgule fixe | [1996/15] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 13.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.12.2002 | DE | 05.03.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/02] | DE | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0450754 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 14, line 25 - line 32 *; | [A]FR2637707 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * figures 3,4 *; | [A] - E. SCHWARZ ET AL., "Parallel High-Radix Nonrestoring Division", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, NEW YORK US, vol. 42, no. 10, pages 1234 - 1246, XP000418441 [A] 1,10 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.257709 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARITHMETIC, 4-6 JUNE 1985, URBANA, IL, USA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, LOS ALAMITOS CA US [A] 1,10 * figure 6 * |