EP0709993 - Phase demodulation method by measuring the time between zero-crossings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleek, Arthur E. 1304 Summertime Place Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | 02 /
Camp, William O., Jr. 119 Ivy Brook Lane Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 03 /
Warchocki, Gary M. 5119 Lisle Road Owego, New York 13827 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1996/18] | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 95480147.8 | 22.09.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19940329363 | 26.10.1994 Original published format: US 329363 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709993 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709993 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709993 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/233 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
H04L27/2337 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/18] | Title | German: | Phasendemodulation durch Messung der Zeitabstände zwischen Nulldurchgängen | [1996/18] | English: | Phase demodulation method by measuring the time between zero-crossings | [1996/18] | French: | Démodulation de phase, par la mesure du temp entre passages par zéro | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2040150 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]DE3122017 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0576826 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5,7-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 9 * * figure 7 *; | [A] - LAW ET AL, "TRANSMISSION QUALITY OF 10 MBIT/S ETHERNET DATA FRAMES USING DPSK IN WIRELESS INDOOR ENVIRONMENT", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), IEEE, NY, US, (19940501), page 758-762, XP000438611 [A] 3,4,9,10 * abstract * |