EP0694253 - Mould for the formation of cheeses and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MECANIZADOS BUSQUI, S.L. C. Domenech i Montaner, nau 8, Poligon Industrial Can Pi de Vilaroch, Sector Q 08191 Rubi (Barcelona) / ES | [2000/15] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states MECANIZADOS BUSQUI, S.L. C. Domenech i Montaner, nau 8, Poligon Industrial Can Pi de Vilaroch, Sector Q E-08191 Rubi (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busqui Llorens, Martin C. Caldes, 31, bxs. 2a E-08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès (Barcelona / ES | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1996/05] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Pg. de Gracia, 33 E-08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 95500105.2 | 19.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | ES19940001676 | 29.07.1994 Original published format: ES 9401676 | [1996/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694253 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694253 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/13, B29C37/00 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
B29C37/0003 (EP);
A01J25/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DK, GB, GR, IT, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | Käseform und Herstellungsverfahren | [1996/05] | English: | Mould for the formation of cheeses and method for its manufacture | [1996/05] | French: | Moule à fromages et méthode de fabrication | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2000 | GR | 12.04.2000 | NL | 12.04.2000 | DK | 12.07.2000 | GB | 19.07.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.04.2000 | |
NL | 12.04.2000 | ||
DK | 12.07.2000 | ||
GB | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.04.2000 | |
NL | 12.04.2000 | ||
GB | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 12.04.2000 | |
GB | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 12.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1270357 (KESSLER) [Y] 4 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 7 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figure -; claim - *; | [XA]FR2384447 (ALPMA ALPENLAND MASCH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 11 - line 19 * * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 40 * * page 4, line 27 - line 34 * * figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 6; | [XAY]FR2447677 (HOLLANDSE PLASTIC IND [NL]) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 4 * * sentence 14 - sentence 17 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 3 [Y] 4; | [X]FR2558684 (FINDELING CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1,3,6 * page 4, line 11 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0344845 (AREND BV [NL]) [DA] 1,3* figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0379752 (CRELLIN BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 2 * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0344845 |