EP0680822 - Method for making packaging of great length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/45] | Method and equipment for making packaging of unlimited length and article obtained | ||
[1999/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANAQUERA, S.L. Cra. Valencia, 79 E-46190 Ribarroja del Turia / ES | [1995/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanaquera Gimeno, José Cra. Valencia, 79 E-46190 Ribarroja del Turia / ES | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Sperlingsweg 32 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [1995/45] | Sanz-Bermell Martinez, Alejandro Játiva, 4 E-46002 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 95560002.8 | 02.05.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | ES19940000924 | 03.05.1994 Original published format: ES 9400924 | ES19950000627 | 30.03.1995 Original published format: ES 9500627 | [1995/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680822 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680822 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680822 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B31B3/00, B31B1/25, B31B1/16 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP);
B31B50/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/45] | B31B3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, PT [1995/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von langen Verpackungsbehältern | [1999/19] | English: | Method for making packaging of great length | [1999/19] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'emballage long | [1999/19] |
Former [1995/45] | Verfahren und Maschine zur Herstellung von langen Verpackungsbehältern und Verpackungsbehälter | ||
Former [1995/45] | Method and equipment for making packaging of unlimited length and article obtained | ||
Former [1995/45] | Procédé et machine pour la fabrication d'emballage allongé et l'article obtenu | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3844201 (EGGERT R, et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 30, paragraph L; figure 33 * * column 32, line 36 - line 42 *; | [X]EP0407354 (FOSBER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2055743 (KLEIN EDMOND) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5042657 (DUNN JEFFREY S [US]); | [A]US2475868 (ANDERSON NELS A); | [A]US3880056 (DOHNALIK JOSEPH J) |