EP0667671 - Motor endshields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dohogne, L. Ranney 12970 Ambois Creve Coeur, Missouri 63141 / US | 02 /
Rosenfeld, Michael J. 1795 Welsh Hills Road Granville, Ohio 43023 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Robbie F. 7345 Woodland Way Pasadena Hills, Missouri 63121 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95630010.7 | 09.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940194885 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 194885 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667671 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/15 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
H02K5/15 (EP,US);
H02K5/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Lagerschild für Elektromotoren | [1995/33] | English: | Motor endshields | [1995/33] | French: | Flasque-palier pour moteurs électriques | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/42] | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3398306 (MERRICK GLENN O, et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 25 - line 56 * * column 6, line 5 - line 24; figure - * [A] 2,3,5,7; | [YA]US3900234 (RODDY JOSEPH T, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 41 - line 56; figures 2-4 * [A] 8 |