EP0693645 - Gasket for refrigerant compressors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dormer, Michael J. 1820 Pompey Center Road Fabius, New York 13063 / US | 02 /
Kaido, Peter F. 5868 Country Drive Verona, New York 13478 / US | 03 /
Kneeskern, David F. Box 1473, Rt. 10 Pennellville, New York 13132 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95630059.4 | 08.06.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | US19940265486 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: US 265486 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693645 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693645 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/12, F16J15/02 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
F16J15/068 (EP);
F16J15/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/04] | Title | German: | Flachdichtung für Kältemittelverdichter | [1996/04] | English: | Gasket for refrigerant compressors | [1996/04] | French: | Joint plat pour compresseur de réfrigérant | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2169362 (LECHLER ELRING DICHTUNGSWERKE) [Y] 1 * claims 1,3,5 * [A] 3; | [YA]US4728111 (YOSHIJIMA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 12; figure - * [A] 4; | [A]DE7336951U (MTU) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claims 1,2 * |