Designated contracting states | BE | | DE | | DK | Lapse: 14.10.1999 | ES | | FR | Lapse: 14.07.1999 | GB | | IE | | IT | Lapse: 14.07.1999 | NL | | Examination procedure | 13.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 14.07.1999 | Opposition procedure | 28.09.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | | Appeal following opposition | 03.05.2005 | APPEAL FILED | 14.07.2005 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 08.08.2007 | APPEAL RESULT | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 10.12.1999 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Event date: | 15.11.1995 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL | | Event date: | 14.07.1999 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL | | Event date: | 10.07.1996 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19960515 | | Event date: | 12.02.1997 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19961227 | | Event date: | 19.08.1999 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69510725 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19990819 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 16.09.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2133700 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 22.09.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 17.05.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH R&T-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIE | Effective DATE: | 20000320 | | Event date: | 07.06.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH R&T-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIE | Effective DATE: | 20000329 | | Event date: | 07.06.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | SUED-CHEMIE AG | Effective DATE: | 20000414 | | Event date: | 03.07.2000 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH R&T-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIE | | Event date: | 01.08.2000 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH R&T-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIE | | Event date: | 01.08.2000 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | SUED-CHEMIE AG | | Event date: | 01.07.2002 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG | | Event date: | 01.07.2002 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | SUED-CHEMIE AG | | Event date: | 24.05.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH R&T-INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIE | Effective DATE: | 20000329 | | Event date: | 15.05.2002 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG * 20000414 SUED-C | Effective DATE: | 20000329 | | Event date: | 07.12.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC. | | Event date: | 01.02.2006 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | ELEMENTIS SPECIALTIES, INC. | Effective DATE: | 20051207 | | Event date: | 14.10.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19991014 | | Event date: | 18.11.2009 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20091118 | | Event date: | 18.11.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | BE DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL | | Event date: | 01.02.2010 | | Event description: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | Effective DATE: | 20091118 | | Event date: | 21.04.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES DC2A 20100211 T5 | Code Expl.: | PATENT MODIFIED | | Event date: | 01.04.2010 | | Event description: | NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE | | Event date: | 30.11.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20100219 | | Event date: | 29.07.2011 | | Event description: | PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Effective DATE: | 20110406 | | Event date: | 28.06.2013 | | Event description: | PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Effective DATE: | 20110406 | | Event date: | 04.11.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE | | Event date: | 31.07.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20140527 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.07.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20140527 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VP-IP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE | | Event date: | 04.11.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VP-IP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE | | Event date: | 29.08.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20140526 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.08.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20140529 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.08.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20140526 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.09.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20140530 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 16.05.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R039 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION ACTION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20110527 | | Event date: | 15.04.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R006 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | APPEAL FILED | | Event date: | 27.05.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R008 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT | | Event date: | 21.07.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R074 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | +RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED | Effective DATE: | 20110406 | | Event date: | 19.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R040 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | +WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 19.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 29.04.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R008 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT | | Event date: | 23.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R040 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | +WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL | Effective DATE: | 20150119 | | Event date: | 11.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 20.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL V4 | Code Expl.: | -DISCONTINUED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20150510 | | Event date: | 03.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20150509 | | Event date: | 10.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 01.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MK9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150509 | | Event date: | 26.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20150826 | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150510 | | Event date: | 04.11.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER PA, DE | | Event date: | 05.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R042 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT'S REVOCATION IN FULL NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 20150505 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150511 | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER MU, DE | | Event date: | 04.11.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 69510725 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LS-MP VON PUTTKAMER BERNGRUBER LOTH SPUHLER MU, DE | | Event date: | 14.07.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 19990714 | | Event date: | 14.07.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19990714 | | Event date: | 05.11.2014 | | Event description: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Event date: | 29.10.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON CLOSURE OF APPEAL PROCEDURE DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDNOA9O | | Event date: | 29.10.2014 | | Event description: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Event date: | 16.10.2009 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 16.10.2007 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 16.10.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 16.10.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDNOA2O | | Event date: | 16.10.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDNOA3O | | Event date: | 16.10.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 07.10.2005 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 05.10.2005 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 21.07.2005 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 12.05.2005 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 06.05.2005 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 28.05.1999 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 24.02.1999 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 17.12.1998 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 17.12.1998 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 04.09.1998 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 29.09.1995 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 16.10.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009264 | | Event date: | 27.11.2007 | | Event description: | REPLY TO EXAMINATION REPORT IN OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNORE3 | | Event date: | 01.11.2007 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION REPORT IN OPPOSITION DESPATCHED + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNORE2 | | Event date: | 25.11.2005 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 02.03.2005 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 21.01.2005 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009264 | | Event date: | 28.03.2002 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 17.01.2001 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 23.11.2000 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 25.09.2000 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 25.05.2000 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 20.04.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 17.04.2000 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Event date: | 07.04.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 31.03.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |