EP0708024 - Method and apparatus for introducing articles into a packaging sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIG Schweizerische Industrie-Gesellschaft 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states SIG Schweizerische Industrie-Gesellschaft CH-8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strasser, Thomas Mettlenstrasse 209 CH-8463 Benken / CH | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95810577.7 | 18.09.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | CH19940002998 | 05.10.1994 Original published format: CH 299894 | [1996/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708024 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/06, B65B57/12 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B65B23/18 (EP);
B65B57/12 (EP);
B65B9/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einführen von Gegenständen in einen Verpackungsschlauch | [1996/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for introducing articles into a packaging sleeve | [1996/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour introduire des articles dans un manchon d'emballage | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2204552 (OMORI MACHINERY) [X] 8 * page 7, line 14 - page 10, line 7; figure - * [A] 1; | [XA]DE3615442 (FUJI MACHINERY CO [JP]) [X] 8 * page 10, line 7 - page 13, line 26; figure - * [A] 1; | [XA]GB2138381 (BAKER PERKINS HOLDINGS PLC) [X] 8 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 26; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]US4722168 (HEANEY STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 44; figure - * | by applicant | DE1136928 |