EP0713736 - Holding device for preforms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse Technology & Management AG Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [1996/40] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states Alusuisse-Lonza Services AG Postfach 428 CH-8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röllin, Erich Langrietstr. 16 CH-8212 Neuhausen / CH | 02 /
Huber, Hansjörg Echostr. 30 CH-8212 Neuhausen / CH | 03 /
Gabathuler, Jean-Pierre Friedhofweg 2d CH-8226 Schleitheim / CH | [1996/22] | Application number, filing date | 95810678.3 | 30.10.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | CH19940003516 | 22.11.1994 Original published format: CH 351694 | [1996/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0713736 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0713736 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713736 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/00, F27D3/12, C22C1/00 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
F27D5/00 (EP,US);
B22D17/007 (EP,US);
C21D9/0025 (EP,US);
C22C1/12 (EP,US);
F27D3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/22] | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung für Bolzen | [1996/22] | English: | Holding device for preforms | [1996/22] | French: | Dispositif de retenue pour préformes | [1996/22] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0513523 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [DX] 1,9* column 4, line 14 - line 30 *; | [PX]EP0645206 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [PX] 1,3,4,7-9 * column 6, line 35 - line 48; figures 2,3; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE2229453 | DE3006618 | EP0131175 | EP0513523 |