EP0774701 - Process and program for a numerical control of a machine tool and a numerical control which works with means of this program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tornos SA rue Industrielle 111 2740 Moutier / CH | [2003/01] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states Tornos-Bechler SA 111 rue Industrielle CH-2740 Moutier / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Pierre Champ de la Pierre 96 2736 Sorvilier / CH | 02 /
Paroz, Cedric Bas de la Sauce 64 2732 Saicourt / CH | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 95810724.5 | 17.11.1995 | [1997/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774701 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774701 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/416 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
G05B19/416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/21] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Programm einer numerischen Steuerung einer Werkzeugmaschine und numerische Steuerung, die mit Mitteln dieses Programms arbeitet | [1997/21] | English: | Process and program for a numerical control of a machine tool and a numerical control which works with means of this program | [1997/21] | French: | Procédé et programme de commande numérique de machine-outil ainsi que commande numérique fonctionnant au moyen de ce programme | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 05.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2003
14.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2003
14.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2003
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 05.02.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/41] | Appeal following opposition | 24.11.2006 | Appeal received No. T1803/06 | 05.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 02.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2003 | CH | 12.03.2003 | LI | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | DK | 12.06.2003 | PT | 12.06.2003 | SE | 12.06.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | [2010/05] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | NL | 12.03.2003 | |
PT | 12.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 12.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0474603 (TORNOS SA FABRIQUE DE MACHINE [CH]) [DA] 1-22 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 42; figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column A *; | [A]US5392207 (WILSON GREGORY S [US], et al) [A] 1-22* column 5, line 42 - column 11, line 62; figures 1-4 * |