EP0729186 - MOS-technology power device integrated structure and manufacturing process thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | ||
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimaldi, Antonio Corso San Vito, 186/R I-95030 Mascalucia / IT | 02 /
Schillaci, Antonino Via Contesse, 31/A I-98100 Messina / IT | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830055.0 | 24.02.1995 | [1996/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729186 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729186 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L29/423 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
H01L29/0696 (EP);
H01L29/1095 (EP);
H01L29/41741 (EP);
H01L29/4238 (EP);
H01L29/66712 (EP,US);
H01L29/0619 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/35] | Title | German: | Leistungsbauelement als integrierte Struktur in MOS-Technologie und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/35] | English: | MOS-technology power device integrated structure and manufacturing process thereof | [1996/35] | French: | Structure intégrée de dispositif de puissance en technologie MOS et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 28.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0393949 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 1,4-24 * figure - *; | [Y]JPH02143566 ; | [Y]EP0358389 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 5,20-24 * abstract *; | [YA]EP0119400 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 7 * figures 1, 2A-2I * [A] 20-24; | [Y]US5160985 (AKIYAMA HAJIME) [Y] 11 * column 3, line 1 - line 48; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US4901127 (CHOW TAT-SING P ET AL) [Y] 17,19 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3902300 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 50 * * column 5, line 6 - line 30; figure 1 7A *; | [A]EP0279403 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0211972 (EATON CORP) [A] 8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900821), vol. 014, no. 387, Database accession no. (E - 0967), & JP02143566 A 19900601 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,4-16,18 * abstract * |