EP0751622 - Electronically driven switch, integrated circuit and electronic card using the switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricotti, Giulio Via L. Da Vinci, 78 I-27043 Broni, (Pavia) / IT | 02 /
Bardelli, Roberto Via Mosè Bianchi, 24 I-20149 Milano / IT | 03 /
Rossi, Domenico Via Roma, 159 I-27024 Civalegna, (Pavia) / IT | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830277.0 | 30.06.1995 | [1997/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751622 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751622 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/687, G06K19/07 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
H03K17/6874 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
H03K17/6872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/01] | Title | German: | Elektronisch getriebener Schalter, diesen verwendende integrierte Schaltung und elektronische Karte | [1997/01] | English: | Electronically driven switch, integrated circuit and electronic card using the switch | [1997/01] | French: | Commutateur commandé électroniquement, circuit intégré et carte électronique utilisant le commutateur | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Request for further processing for: | 12.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.09.2004 | DE | 16.12.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/03] | DE | 16.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2445662 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 7,8 * page 24, line 30 - page 31, line 24; figure 11 *; | [Y]EP0281142 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 9,10* column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 38; figure 4 *; | [XY]EP0505283 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 10, line 24 - line 53; figures 26-29 * [Y] 3-5,7-10; | [Y]EP0620646 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 3-5 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 36; figures 5,6 * |