EP0766042 - System for automatically controlling the supply of a basic substance to a combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. AZIENDA ANSALDO Piazza Carignano, 2 16128 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. AZIENDA ANSALDO Piazza Carignano, 2 I-16128 Genova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frontini, Luis Corso F. Magellano, 1D/8 I-16149 Genova / IT | 02 /
Repetto, Francesco Via Agnesi, 9/6 I-16161 Cogoleto (Genova) / IT | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Maggioni, Claudio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/14] | Falcetti, Carlo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830402.4 | 29.09.1995 | [1997/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766042 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23J1/00, F23G5/50, F23J7/00 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
F23J7/00 (EP,US);
F23G5/50 (EP,US);
F23G2207/101 (EP,US);
F23G2207/103 (EP,US);
F23G2207/104 (EP,US);
F23G2207/107 (EP,US);
F23G2207/60 (EP,US);
F23G2900/55003 (EP,US);
F23J2215/30 (EP,US);
F23J2219/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1997/24] |
Former [1997/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung der Zuführung einer basischen Substanz zu einem Verbrennungsraum | [1997/14] | English: | System for automatically controlling the supply of a basic substance to a combustion chamber | [1997/14] | French: | Système pour contrôler automatiquement l'alimentation d'une substance basique à une chambre de combustion | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 11.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0605041 (FINMECCANICA SPA [IT]) [YD] 1,3,5-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0380143 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5-7 * column 3, line 26 - line 55; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9508081 (EUROSIM [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4027040 (STEINMÜLLER) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 48 - line 65 *; | [A]US5024171 (KRIGMONT HENRY V [US], et al); | [AD]US5185134 (GULLETT BRIAN K [US]) |