Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6468866 | 22.10.2002 | B2 | US2001011722 | 09.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | US42723799 | 26.10.1999 | US73946596 | 29.10.1996 | US93350597 | 18.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6566690 | 20.05.2003 | B2 | US2001012663 | 09.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | US73946696 | 29.10.1996 | US95108197 | 15.10.1997 | US42723699 | 26.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5981343 | 09.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | US73946696 | 29.10.1996 | US95108197 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5985721 | 16.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | US73946596 | 29.10.1996 | US93350597 | 18.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09298301 | Global Dossier | 18.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0772242 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2006 | B1 | EP0772242 | 07.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534919T | 25.01.2007 | T2 | DE69534919D1 | 18.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5981998 | 09.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6064087 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP95830454 | 30.10.1995 |