EP0772242 - Single feature size MOS technology power device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE, IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | |||
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | |||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno - CoRiMMe Stradale Primosole, 50 95100 Catania / IT | |||
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frisina, Ferruccio Via Tre Torri, 11 I-95030 Sant'Agata li Battiati (Catania) / IT | 02 /
Magri', Angelo Via F. Cairoli, 28/B I-95032 Belpasso (Catania) / IT | 03 /
Ferla, Giuseppe Via Acicastello, 12 I-95126 Catania / IT | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/10] | Gatti, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l. Via Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/19] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830454.5 | 30.10.1995 | [1997/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772242 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772242 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L29/10, H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L21/331 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/66333 (EP,US);
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L29/0869 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Leistungsbauteil in MOS-Technologie mit einer einzelnen kritischen Grösse | [1997/19] | English: | Single feature size MOS technology power device | [1997/19] | French: | Dispositif de puissance en technologie MOS avec une seule dimension critique | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | IE | 31.10.2006 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/21] | NL | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0405138 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,10-18,20-24,27-29,31-36 * column W *; | [Y]EP0304839 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,10-18,20-24,27-29,31-36 * column W *; | [A]US4345265 (BLANCHARD RICHARD A) [A] 1,7,8,10 * column W *; | [A]WO9411904 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [A] 1,11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0252236 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,7-9 * column W *; | [A]JPH03185737 ; | [A]JPS6247162 ; | [A]JPH01272163 ; | [A]JPH04256367 ; | [A]JPH04349660 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911111), vol. 015, no. 442, Database accession no. (E - 1131), & JP03185737 A 19910813 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870728), vol. 011, no. 231, Database accession no. (E - 527), & JP62047162 A 19870228 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,6,25 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900124), vol. 014, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 878), & JP01272163 A 19891031 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,6,26 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 039, Database accession no. (E - 1311), & JP04256367 A 19920911 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930426), vol. 017, no. 213, Database accession no. (E - 1356), & JP04349660 A 19921204 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 5,30 * abstract * | Examination | EP0543313 | US5047367 | EP0480635 | EP0623960 | DE3519389 | EP0022001 |