Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
01.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
26.01.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] |
21.07.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] |