EP0716013 - Arrangement in the transfer of electric current to a propulsion device provided with an electric motor in a ship or equivalent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AQUAMASTER-RAUMA LTD. PL 220 SF-26101 Rauma / FI | [1996/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niemi, Aarno Sampaanalantie 15 Fin-26820 Rauma / FI | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 95850224.7 | 08.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | FI19940005788 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: FI 945788 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716013 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B63H23/24, H01R39/64 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
B63H23/24 (EP,US);
H01R39/646 (EP,US);
B63H2005/1258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Übertragung von elektrischem Strom zu einer Antriebsvorrichtung mit einem elektrischen Motor in einem Schiff oder ähnlichem | [1996/24] | English: | Arrangement in the transfer of electric current to a propulsion device provided with an electric motor in a ship or equivalent | [1996/24] | French: | Dispositif pour le transfert de courant électrique à un dispositif de propulsion équipé d'un moteur électrique dans un bateau ou similaire | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/53] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0590867 (KVAERNER MASA YARDS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-11 * column A; figure - *; | [Y]US3404312 (GILBERT CHARLES H) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 1 - line 31; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5281364 (STIRLING D ROBERT [GB], et al) [Y] 8 * column A *; | [Y]FR1300960 (O.VON MOSSIN) [Y] 10,11 * page 2, column 2, line 16 - line 19; figure - *; | [A]US4066032 (TRAVIS CALVIN C) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 29; figure - *; | [A]DE815989 (RICCOMAGNO GUGLIELMO) [A] 1-11 * figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3604967 | FI60326 |