EP0724513 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INJECTION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMOLD PARTNERS L.P. Glenbrook Industrial Park, Glenbrook Road 652 Stamford, CT 06906 / US | [1996/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBAR, Jean-Pierre 306 Carter Street New Canaan, CT 06840 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95900363.3 | 13.10.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994US11712 | Priority number, date | US19930138673 | 18.10.1993 Original published format: US 138673 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511122 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724513 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/02 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B29C45/568 (EP,US);
B29C33/565 (EP,US);
B29C45/54 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0098 (EP,US);
B29C2045/545 (EP,US);
B29C2791/008 (EP,US);
B29C45/1753 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN | [1996/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INJECTION MOLDING | [1996/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | [1996/32] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1995 | Search fee paid | 27.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 09.01.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4124308 (SOKOLOW NICKOLAS N) | [Y] - COMPOSITES MANUFACTURING, Volume 1, No. 2, issued June 1990, P.S. ALLAN et al., "Development and Application of Multiple Live-Feed Moulding for the Management of Fibres in Moulded Parts"pages 79-84. | [Y] - J. FRADOS, Plastics Engineering Handbook, Fourth Edition, published 1976, by VAN NOSTRAND COMPANYpages 90-93. |